Trustees LITTLEHAMPTON UNIT 215 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 305392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Moore | Chair | 20 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Thomas Charles Sparks | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Ham-Riche | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phil Cooling | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lt Cdr RNR Retired Charles Peter Fabian Ripley RD | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAPT JOHN STOY RD JP RNR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN MUNDY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.