SOMPTING VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Maxwell Chair 19 January 2020 None on record
ANDREW THROWER Trustee 20 April 2015 None on record
Philip Lovesay Mr Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
BARBARA JOAN EARLEY MANAGER Trustee None on record
BARRY EARLEY Trustee 12 September 2014 None on record
COLIN EDKINS Trustee None on record
Stephen Stripp Stripp Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
Brian Read Trustee 09 February 2020
THE OLD SOUTHERONIANS ASSOCIATION WELFARE TRUST Received: On time