BERWICK ST JOHN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the Charity is to maintain and administer the Village Hall as a meeting place for all members of the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £14,518
Total expenditure: £9,726

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
K F MEADE Chair
None on record
Yvonne Janette Follett Trustee 12 March 2025
BERWICK ST JOHN PCC
Received: On time
Susan Kirkland Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
PETER WEINER Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
John DelNero Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Neil Mortenson Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Robert Carter Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Richard Hall Trustee 31 March 2012
None on record
ANTONY LEWIS BELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.68k £2.53k £3.43k £4.93k £14.52k
Total expenditure £2.64k £1.94k £4.33k £4.89k £9.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cranborne Lodge
Berwick St. John
SHAFTESBURY
Wiltshire
SP7 0EX
Phone:
01747829164
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available