Accounts and annual returns CORSLEY WAR MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 305497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required