Financial history CORSLEY WAR MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 305497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £4.40k £3.87k £4.88k £9.02k £14.37k
Total expenditure £7.85k £3.86k £4.28k £8.38k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.20k