Accounts and annual returns DONHEAD ST MARY REMEMBRANCE FIELD

Charity number: 305503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 March 2022 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2020 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 October 2020 714 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required