THE WILTSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 October 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Burrough | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN ELIZABETH JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.02k | £25.70k | £62.76k | £57.33k | £63.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.24k | £30.24k | £53.72k | £56.12k | £58.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH JANURY, 1972. as amended on 27 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
AN ASSOCIATION OF YOUNG FARMER'S CLUBS
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Y F C OFFICE
LACKHAM COLLEGE
LACOCK
CHIPPENHAM
WILTS
SN15 2NY
- Phone:
- 07957951994
- Email:
- wiltshireyfc@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window