Accounts and annual returns 23RD BATH (AVONVALE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305615
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 March 2022 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 March 2019 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required