1ST KESGRAVE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN COMBER Trustee 01 January 1986 None on record
JUDITH FRANCIS Trustee 01 June 1996
SPORT, AMENITIES, RECREATION IN KESGRAVE Received: On time
Carole Brown Trustee 28 June 2014 None on record
TONY SMITH Trustee 01 April 1992 None on record
JONATHAN ASHLEY Trustee 22 October 2012 None on record
CARL GLOESS Chair 17 June 2004 None on record
JEAN BRIDLE Trustee 01 September 1983 None on record
KAREN PRINGLE Trustee 10 May 2000
KESGRAVE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY Received: On time
Gareth Cox Trustee 01 January 2013 None on record
TRACEY VOBE Trustee 01 January 2008 None on record
Michelle Higgins Trustee 16 June 2017
THREE BEARS PLAYGROUP Received: On time
TRACEY SCASE Trustee 01 November 2007 None on record
CELIA COMBER Trustee 01 July 1988 None on record
Alan Brown Trustee 06 March 2017 None on record
CAROL BALL Trustee 01 January 1991 None on record
Alison Myers Trustee 17 September 2018 None on record
Nick Heppleston Trustee 27 June 2015 None on record
Sarah Linsell Trustee 17 September 2018
THE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF CEDARWOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL Received: On time
Jo Saagi Trustee 16 July 2006 None on record