6TH BURY ST. EDMUNDS (ST.MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.52k £7.87k £8.09k £16.29k £5.74k
Total expenditure £5.58k £9.68k £6.81k £6.27k £7.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A