Financial history 1ST TATTENHAMS (ST.MARK`S) SCOUTGROUP

Charity number: 305689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.01k £17.96k £21.87k £26.03k £20.39k
Total expenditure £16.16k £15.54k £21.96k £13.57k £27.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.24k £8.00k