1ST CATERHAM (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305694
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.67k £12.37k £8.90k £10.99k £11.10k
Total expenditure £9.84k £9.87k £12.84k £8.73k £10.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A