2ND STONELEIGH (ST JOHNS) GROUP SCOUTS

Charity number: 305720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.26k £4.16k £5.81k £6.19k £6.49k
Total expenditure £3.19k £3.85k £5.01k £6.02k £5.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A