1ST HINCHLEYWOOD BROWNIE GUIDE UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various educational activities following the Guiding Uk principles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 July 1966: Standard registration
- 1ST HINCHLEY WOOD BROWNIES (Working name)
- 1ST HINCHLEYWOOD BROWNIE GUIDE UNIT (Working name)
- HINCHLEYWOOD GIRL GUIDE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS GEORGINA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.16k | £4.43k | £4.96k | £4.22k | £4.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.18k | £4.88k | £4.62k | £4.47k | £4.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED OF 1938; LEASE DATED 14TH FEBRUARY 1966.
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE GIRL GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
HINCHLEY WOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 HOLLY AVENUE
WALTON-ON-THAMES
KT12 3AT
- Phone:
- 01932887431
- Email:
- gm.sibley@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window