2ND MOLESEY (ST PAUL'S)SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305730
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £35.73k £34.53k £39.11k £37.66k £49.34k
Total expenditure £37.59k £40.79k £32.82k £38.27k £45.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.56k £300 £9.20k N/A