Trustees 1ST SHEPPERTON (ST. NICHOLAS) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305794
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Albert Brimble | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Annette Marie McMINN | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin HARE | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John ROE | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Child | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Phillip Mark Austen-Reed | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Major Thomas David Holroyd OAKLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Claire Vassallo | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Patricia MAMMEN | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
David CAULDER | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Josephine May ALEXANDER | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS NYCKI DAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR GEOFF LULHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUSTIN SIMON DALTREY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.