1ST WALTON-ON-THAMES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required