THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION GREATER LONDON WEST

Charity number: 305817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 July 2017 On time Download