THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION GREATER LONDON WEST

Charity number: 305817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £180.37k £250.87k £353.02k £249.43k £222.92k
Total expenditure £130.04k £215.35k £216.34k £219.61k £186.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A