1ST BREDE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 May 2018 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 March 2018 421 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required