1ST BREDE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.69k £8.09k £4.10k £16.34k £2.67k
Total expenditure £6.77k £5.92k £4.17k £27.53k £3.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A