BURGESS HILL BROWNIE AND GUIDE ASSOCIATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES AND MAINTAINS PREMISES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE BURGESS HILL GIRLGUIDING DIVISION. ALL GUIDERS, LEADERS AND HELPERS ARE VOLUNTEERS AND SELF SUPPORTING. THEY PROVIDE TRAINING EDUCATION AND SUPPORT TO YOUNG GIRLS IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, RELIGION, ABILITY ENCOURAGE FRIENDSHIP, LEADERSHIP, TEAM SPIRIT, GOOD CITIZENSHIP, HEALTHY LIVING, MUCH NEEDED AFTER SCHOOL ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Richards B.A. Hons. | Chair | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ella Ward | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
LEIGH DENISE ELIZABETH BEAVER | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET SAMUEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.71k | £8.61k | £13.86k | £12.46k | £17.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.80k | £6.02k | £5.64k | £12.79k | £12.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY,MENTALLY,PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 09 November 1994 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cringleford
Five Ash Down
UCKFIELD
TN22 3AN
- Phone:
- 01825 733432
- Email:
- in.richards@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window