HASTINGS RYE AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 September 2021 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 September 2021 324 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On time Download