Trustees HASTINGS RYE AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305856
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER WALKER Chair
1ST NORTHIAM SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
1ST HASTINGS SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 22 days
Adam Christopher Liversidge Nichols Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Adam James Weddle Trustee 28 August 2023
None on record
Georgia Hobden Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
Joseph Peter Griffin Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
Andrew Brian Pope Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Steve Pickering Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Kerry LAMB Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Trudi Adams Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Kenneth James French Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
BRIAN FREDERICK FOX Trustee 01 December 1978
1ST HASTINGS SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 22 days
1ST NORTHIAM SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
MR KEN SCOTT Trustee
None on record