Accounts and annual returns 3RD HOVE (ST LEONARD'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required