3RD HOVE (ST LEONARD'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.15k £26.79k £23.32k £25.90k £16.98k
Total expenditure £37.85k £24.96k £20.24k £24.99k £4.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k