WORTHING DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305916
Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 178 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 178 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 July 2018 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 July 2018 154 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 July 2017 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 July 2017 172 days late Download