WORTHING DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305916
Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Willett Trustee 01 January 2012 None on record
ALASTAIR RICHARD PAUL CHARTRES Trustee
2ND WORTHING SCOUT GROUP Overdue by 178 days
Wendy Robertson Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Sally Grant Trustee 01 July 2011 None on record
Stuart Burchett Trustee 01 April 2013 None on record
Mike Hudgell Trustee 01 April 2013 None on record
Petula Bladen Trustee 23 July 2020
2ND WORTHING SCOUT GROUP Overdue by 178 days
8TH WORTHING SEA SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
BARBARA JACQUELINE WELLS Trustee
2ND WORTHING SCOUT GROUP Overdue by 178 days
Simon Payne Trustee 01 September 2016
2ND WORTHING SCOUT GROUP Overdue by 178 days