Financial history THE BENTHAM-MOXON TRUST

Charity number: 305966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £174.74k £178.14k £182.86k £184.86k £221.93k
Total expenditure £186.58k £169.64k £208.12k £90.35k £115.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A