CONCORD VIDEO AND FILM COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 305990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 15 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 21 February 2017 On time Download