Trustees FOREST SCHOOL CAMPS
Charity number: 306006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
36 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alma Fay Okkum Collins | Chair | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jane Steward | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celeste Datta | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
May Dorothy Zanetti MacKeith | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Iona Ahmadzadeh | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wood-Uwins | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HUW PRICE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Simon Hafter | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugo Buckle Heagren | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Hall | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mary Birch Powell | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grizelda Susan Hafter | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Abbott | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jac St John | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stone | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christian Kaye | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Sykes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Meekings | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Robert Hanson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tomos Llewelyn Ford | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALTHEA SMITH | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
FEIMATTA CONTEH | Trustee | 07 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Piete Brooks | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Grainger | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE KEAM | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elilta Eve Summers | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Julia Whinnett | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|||||
LLEWELLYN GORE | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRYSON GORE | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
LEE MONK | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH STEED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAPHNE CARRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOEL JAMES ADAM SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW FREEDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES RAINFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DANIEL SIMON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.