THE DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS

Charity number: 306025
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £646.38k £683.64k £665.00k £690.63k £665.40k
Total expenditure £607.63k £692.75k £744.09k £756.46k £776.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £106.35k £59.92k £120.64k £100.40k £82.67k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £249.98k £224.55k £265.49k £0
Income - Charitable activities £215.06k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £324.98k £373.74k £307.46k £324.74k £336.30k
Income - Other £0 £0 £12.35k £0 £246.43k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £580.46k £673.59k £723.28k £732.24k £738.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.17k £19.16k £20.81k £24.22k £38.71k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £6.40k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0