THE DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS

Charity number: 306025

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRACE WILLIMOTT Trustee None on record
Shalina Sharma Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
Curt Fahndrich Trustee 14 May 2014
THE CARPENTERS AND DOCKLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Philip Elson Trustee 20 November 2017 None on record
ALAN GEORGE STEAD FCA Trustee None on record
MONTAGUE JOHN MEYER Chair
CRANLEIGH FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
LAUREN SPENCER Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record
TRACEY ANNE CUNNINGHAM Trustee 09 January 2013 None on record
MARTIN YOUNG Trustee 09 January 2013
TOWER HAMLETS COMMUNITY TRANSPORT Charity reporting is up to date
THE CARPENTERS AND DOCKLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE
THE ATTLEE FOUNDATION Charity reporting is 35 days late
MARK PATRICK SEEBOLD HORN BENG MSC Trustee
THE CARPENTERS AND DOCKLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE