Accounts and annual returns HISTORY OF PARLIAMENT TRUST

Charity number: 306034
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 March 2022 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window