Financial history HISTORY OF PARLIAMENT TRUST

Charity number: 306034
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.72m £1.79m £1.86m £1.87m £1.82m
Total expenditure £1.65m £1.72m £1.88m £1.97m £1.81m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.63m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £1.65m £1.68m £1.67m £1.67m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.68m £78.28k £88.40k £93.28k £85.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.78k £944 £2.35k £4.30k £2.30k
Income - Other £35.61k £57.04k £88.80k £95.05k £61.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £1.55m £1.71m £1.80m £1.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.54k
Expenditure - Governance £136.19k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £136.19k £177.91k £172.89k £171.63k £118.72k