Trustees HISTORY OF PARLIAMENT TRUST

Charity number: 306034
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gordon Marsden Chair
DARTMOUTH STREET TRUST
Received: On time
VILLIERS PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Dame Clare Moriarty Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Christopher John Bryant Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Rt. Hon Christopher James Skidmore Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Dame Eleanor Laing Trustee 06 February 2020
None on record
Lord Monroe Edward Palmer Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record
Sarah Alice Ruth Davies Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Lord Robert Lisvane Trustee 21 March 2017
None on record
DR Philippa Tudor Trustee 02 July 2014
None on record
Dr KWASI ALFRED ADDO KWARTENG MP Trustee 04 January 2012
None on record
LORD CLARK OF WINDERMERE Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR THE LORD NORTON OF LOUTH Trustee
None on record
LORD ROWLANDS Trustee
None on record