THE LORD'S TAVERNERS

Charity number: 306054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abeed Janmohamed Trustee 14 September 2021 None on record
Sandra Verkuyten OBE Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Suzanne Christopher Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
Gordon Kennedy Trustee 06 April 2020 None on record
Bob Bevan Trustee 14 September 2021 None on record
Caj Sohal Trustee 15 October 2019 None on record
Mike Gatting Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
Richard White Trustee 09 October 2014 None on record
Julie Norris Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Alistair Subba Row Trustee 07 April 2017 None on record
Ian Martin Trustee 01 August 2019
NEUROMUSCULAR CENTRE Received: On time
Tim Luckhurst Trustee 06 April 2020 None on record