THE MACCABI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £9.64k £21.65k £383 £0 £0
Total expenditure £125.46k £123.14k £777.01k £21.60k £21.60k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A