THE NATIONAL YOUTH THEATRE OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY THAT OF YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 14 TO 25 YEARS THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF DRAMA, MUSIC AND THE SPOKEN WORD AND THROUGH AN UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE BRITISH DRAMATIC HERITAGE. FURTHER DETAILS CAN BE OBTAINED FROM THE WEBSITE www.nyt.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,508,799
Donations and legacies | £389.78k | |
Charitable activities | £2.49m | |
Other trading activities | £397.80k | |
Investments | £65.95k | |
Other | £167.96k |
Total expenditure:
£4,068,431
Raising funds | £572.49k | |
Charitable activities | £3.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £534,738 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £572.49k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.50m |
People

31 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
278 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- China
- Northern Ireland
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 November 1961: Standard registration
- NATIONAL YOUTH THEATRE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAWN ELIZABETH AIREY | Chair | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Martin Whitehead | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Butler | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Frederick York | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA DARKWA-OHEMENG | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hung Han Yun | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatobi Gladys Ama Kyeremateng | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Clive Elton | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Maitland Moore | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prasanna Puwanarajah | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOCKLEY | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA HOWSON | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SIMON STOCKILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN EDWARD CAPPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY FITZPATRICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Janet Michell Ellis MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91m | £5.72m | £4.91m | £3.50m | £3.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.02m | £2.10m | £3.64m | £3.78m | £4.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £269.30k | £2.86m | £1.42m | £422.11k | £534.74k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £515.42k | £2.05m | £3.03m | £369.73k | £389.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £394.12k | £0 | £397.80k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.28m | £3.57m | £1.45m | £3.13m | £2.49m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.65k | £127 | £75 | £1.98k | £65.95k | |
|
Income - Other | £108.80k | £95.74k | £37.47k | £0 | £167.96k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £295.32k | £0 | £180.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.74m | £1.96m | £3.39m | £3.47m | £3.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £277.51k | £145.50k | £257.43k | £304.32k | £572.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £55.97k | £19.89k | £18.26k | £23.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.98m | £7.08m | £8.23m | £8.32m | £8.15m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.64m | £3.61m | £3.32m | £3.00m | £2.51m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.14m | £3.46m | £3.04m | £3.10m | £2.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/07/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY THAT OF YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 14 AND 25 YEARS THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF DRAMA, MUSIC AND THE SPOKEN WORD AND THROUGH AN UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE BRITISH DRAMATIC HERITAGE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL YOUTH THEATRE OF GB
443-445 HOLLOWAY ROAD
LONDON
N7 6LW
- Phone:
- 02036967066
- Email:
- info@nyt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window