Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL LIFE SAVING SOCIETY

Charity number: 306094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window