Financial history THE ROYAL LIFE SAVING SOCIETY

Charity number: 306094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £60.58k £71.58k £72.81k £87.09k £52.23k
Total expenditure £63.31k £69.48k £64.82k £32.54k £40.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A