Trustees THE ROYAL LIFE SAVING SOCIETY
Charity number: 306094

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE HOLLAND | Chair | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Thaun Tek Geh | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Bruce | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cavell Patrick Burchell | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Beerman | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John McFarlane | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clark | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Job Kania | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sanath Wijayaratne | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pene Snashall | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
William Clive Patrickson | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
DYLAN TOMMY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.