ROYAL STATISTICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 306096
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £2.05m £2.35m £2.62m £3.04m £2.90m
Total expenditure £2.12m £2.22m £2.38m £2.87m £2.73m