ROYAL STATISTICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 306096
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

33 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Gesine Reinert Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Simon White Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Sara Hilditch Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Dr Robin Mitra Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
BLAISE EGAN Trustee 01 January 2018
BRITISH HUMANIST ASSOCIATION Charity reporting is up to date
Dr Deirdre Toher Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Professor Mario Cortina Borja Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Kevin Barnes Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Professor Emma McCoy Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Dr Shirley Coleman Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Professor Ruth King Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Stephen Penneck Trustee 26 March 2014
SUTTON MUSIC FESTIVAL Charity reporting is up to date
Dr Sophie Carr Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Johanna Hutchinson Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Professor Christl Donnelly Trustee 01 January 2018
THE COLLEGE OF ST PETER LE BAILEY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Charity reporting is up to date
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF LONDON FOR IMPROVING NATURAL KNOWLEDGE (COMMONLY KNOWN AS THE ROYAL SOCIETY) Charity reporting is up to date
Dr Jim Weatherall Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Claire Miller Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Dr Rachel Hilliam Trustee 01 January 2020
1ST MOUNTSORREL SCOUT GROUP Charity reporting is up to date
Professor John Kent Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Professor Thomas Brendan Murphy Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Jamie Sergeant Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Dr Lucy Teece Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Mark Briers Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Dr Anjali Mazumder Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Professor Syliva Richardson Chair 01 January 2020 None on record
Scott Heald Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Katie Harron Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Dr Tom Smith Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Dr Lisa McFetridge Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Sharon Witherspoon Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Emeritus Professor Peter Elias Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Professor Jonathan Forster Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Professor Deborah Ashby Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record