SCHOOLS AMATEUR BOXING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Amateur Boxing in education using a variety of schemes including: Coach education courses for Teachers Boxing Awards Skill Spar Competition Coaching Courses Advice and guidance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
- Manchester City
Governance
- 12 April 1965: Standard registration
- 15 November 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- SCHOOL AMATEUR BOXING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61k | £1.80k | £480 | £245 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £871 | £4.04k | £29 | £600 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1946
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF BOXING AMONG SCHOOLBOYS; GUIDANCE UPON METHODS OF TEACHING AND JUDGIN, AND THE CONDUCT OF COMPETITIONS; THE IMPROVEMENT OF FACILITIES FOR BOXING IN SCHOOLS; AND THE ARRANGEMENT OF THE ANNUAL CHAMPIONSHIPS
Area of benefit
GENERAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window