SION COLLEGE

Charity number: 306142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download