Trustees SION COLLEGE

Charity number: 306142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Revd Canon Alison Joyce Dr Chair 19 April 2016
ST BRIDE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KING'S COLLEGE LONDON THEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE GUILD OF ST BRIDE
Received: On time
Rev Jonathan George Frederick Kester Trustee 04 May 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PIMLICO ST PETER WITH WESTMINSTER CHRIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE PIMLICO ST PETER TRUST
Overdue by 40 days
Rev GRAHAM MARTIN BUCKLE Trustee 04 May 2023
THE BURDETT-COUTTS, TOWNSHEND AND ST STEPHEN'S SCHOOLS, WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN WITH ST JOHN, WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
MRS REBECCA ALDRIDGE
Overdue by 40 days
THE PEPYS TWINING TRUST
Received: On time
WESTMINSTER ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST ANDREWS CHURCH HALL TRUST
Received: On time
COMMUNITY OF ST ANDREW
Received: 34 days late
THE NAPIER HALL TRUST
Overdue by 40 days
Roxanne Fay Eversley Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
DAVID CHARLES JOHN BANKS Trustee 12 May 2022
PRINCESS LOUISE HOLIDAY FUND FOR POOR CHILDREN
Received: On time
THE KENSINGTON SCHOLARSHIPS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES PADDINGTON
Received: On time
Revd Preb Philip Anthony Edwin Chester Trustee 12 May 2022
REBECCA HUSSEY'S BOOK CHARITY
Received: On time
ANGLICAN CATHOLIC FUTURE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW'S WESTMINSTER
Received: 37 days late
Rev James Heard Trustee 29 April 2021
ST JOHN'S HOLLAND ROAD TRUST
Received: 28 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN THE BAPTIST, HOLLAND ROAD, DIOCESE OF KENSINGTON
Received: 25 days late
Rev Christopher Philip Trundle Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Rev Samuel John Cross Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
Rev Mae Christie Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
PAUL DOUBLE LVO Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
Rev MATTHEW ROBERT DUCKETT Trustee 28 April 2015
None on record