Accounts and annual returns YOUNG'S ENDOWED SCHOOL

Charity number: 306165
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required