Financial history YOUNG'S ENDOWED SCHOOL

Charity number: 306165
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.61k £4.70k £5.80k £4.89k £4.99k
Total expenditure £6.05k £4.29k £4.16k £7.63k £4.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A