CLAYESMORE SCHOOL

Charity number: 306214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 July 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 July 2020 21 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 14 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download